ND HB1213 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15-10-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state board of higher education advisers.
Title
State board of higher education advisers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04 | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by Governor 04/04 | |
2011-04-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-15 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Received from House | |
2011-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13 | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 1 0 | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |