ND HB1210 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 60 of section 57-39.2-04 and subsection 27 of section 57-40.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to qualification and notification requirements for sales and use tax exemptions for certain sales made to a senior citizen organization; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Qualification and notification requirements for sales and use tax exemptions for certain sales made to a senior citizen organization; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24 |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rummel Kannianen Piepkorn |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Fisher Motschenbacher Hatlestad |
2023-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-01-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |