ND HB1206 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 61-02-01.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to development of a comprehensive water development plan; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Development of a comprehensive water development plan; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |