ND HB1205 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-40.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to call location information by a wireless service provider to law enforcement.
Title
Call location information by a wireless service provider to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] |
Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/08 | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-24 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee | |
2011-02-04 | Received from House | |
2011-02-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 | |
2011-01-20 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |