ND HB1203 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 072
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 072
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Horne, Robinson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-35.3-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a financial institution tax credit for charitable gifts; to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the income tax credit for charitable gifts; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Horne, Robinson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-35.3-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a financial institution tax credit for charitable gifts; to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the income tax credit for charitable gifts; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 021 nays 072 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 007 n 006 | |
2009-01-14 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1203.html |