ND HB1201 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 6 and 7 of section 65-01-16 and section 65-02-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to changing the name of the workforce safety and insurance office of independent review.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 6 and 7 of section 65-01-16 and section 65-02-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to changing the name of the workforce safety and insurance office of independent review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-13 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 003 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 001 | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1201.html |