ND HB1191 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to service or assistance animals in rental dwelling units.
Title
Service or assistance animals in rental dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 8 |
2015-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 |
2015-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |