ND HB1191 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Reconsidered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-12, subsection 1 of section 39-04-18, and subsection 4 of section 39-04-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to semitrailer plates; and to provide for application.
Title
Semitrailer plates; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-24 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 23 | |
2011-03-21 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-03-18 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from House | |
2011-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 | |
2011-02-15 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |