ND HB1185 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 39-06-09 and 39-08-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability for negligence of a minor driver and accident report forms; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Liability for negligence of a minor driver and accident report forms; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-01 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-25 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |