ND HB1185 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 12.1-32-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to petitions for revocation of probation; to amend and reenact subsection 9 of section 12.1-32-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reduction of felonies to misdemeanors by operation of law; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Reduction of felonies to misdemeanors by operation of law; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:50 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |