ND HB1177 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of veterans' affairs for a national service officer grant program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of veterans' affairs for a national service officer grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] |
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 2 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-10 | House | Request return from committee |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |