ND HB1173 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 28-34-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to costs of appeals of local government decisions.
Title
Costs of appeals of local government decisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |