ND HB1171 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the development and implementation of a skilled workforce student loan repayment program and a skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide continuing appropriations; to provide for transfers; to provide for reports to the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The development and implementation of a skilled workforce student loan repayment program and a skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide continuing appropriations; to provide for transfers; to provide for reports to the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor 04/25 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 21, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Schaible Davison Oban |
2019-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Bosch D. Ruby P. Anderson |
2019-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 10, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |