ND HB1169 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to license plates for mobility-impaired individuals.
Title
License plates for mobility-impaired individuals.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Karen Anderson [R] | Rep. Clayton Fegley [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-01-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |