ND HB1166 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-02-27.1, 57-02-27.2, 57-02-38, and 57-12-09, subsection 4 of section 57-14-08, and section 57-20-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the deletion of obsolete dates and references for the purposes of valuation and assessment of agricultural lands, assessment of unplatted, undeveloped, and nonagricultural real property located outside of a city, and notice requirements for increased property tax assessments; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-02-27.1, 57-02-27.2, 57-02-38, and 57-12-09, subsection 4 of section 57-14-08, and section 57-20-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the deletion of obsolete dates and references for the purposes of valuation and assessment of agricultural lands, assessment of unplatted, undeveloped, and nonagricultural real property located outside of a city, and notice requirements for increased property tax assessments; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 089 nays 001 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-03-17 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-16 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-01-21 | Received from House | |
2009-01-20 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1166.html |