ND HB1163 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-04, subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-05, and section 62.1-02-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The possession of firearms or dangerous weapons; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Sebastian Ertelt [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 10 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |