ND HB1161 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 10-30.5-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to entrepreneurship center awards.
Title
Entrepreneurship center awards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/08 | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-24 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Received from House | |
2011-01-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 | |
2011-01-19 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |