ND HB1145 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on the introduction of legislative bills prepared by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.
Title
Limitations on the introduction of legislative bills prepared by executive branch agencies and the judicial branch.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 39 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 25 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |