ND HB1144 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19, section 50-11.1-02.4, and a new subsection to section 50-11.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to required training for mandated reporters of child abuse and neglect.
Title
Required training for mandated reporters of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 19 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-17 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 16 |
2023-01-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |