ND HB1138 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-32-02 and sections 19-03.1-23 and 39-08-01.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a mental health court program.
Title
A mental health court program.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Cole Conley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 1 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:18 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 5 1 1 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 16 |
2023-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |