ND HB1135 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 47-10.1-01 and 47-10.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions to the acquisition of agricultural land by foreign governments.
Title
Exceptions to the acquisition of agricultural land by foreign governments.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Mike Beltz [R] | Rep. Michael Motschenbacher [R] | Sen. Paul Thomas [R] |
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21 |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2023-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2023-04-11 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:49 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:24 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Division A adopted |
2023-02-20 | House | Division B adopted |
2023-02-20 | House | Division of amendment |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture |