ND HB1135 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.4 and 15.1-21-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship and the North Dakota academic scholarship for high school students enrolled in school districts using course proficiency-based grading systems.
Title
Eligibility for the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship and the North Dakota academic scholarship for high school students enrolled in school districts using course proficiency-based grading systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Claire Cory [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Mark Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-04-14 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 4 |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |