ND HB1133 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-54 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a state artist laureate; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A state artist laureate; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 24 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 67 |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |