ND HB1129 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 15-18.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority of the state board of higher education to provide authorizations to operate private postsecondary educational institutions offering instruction at the associate in arts level or higher and to false academic degrees and accreditation mills; to amend and reenact subsections 1, 4, 7, and 10 of section 15-20.4-01, sections 15-20.4-02 and 15-20.4-02.1, subsections 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, and 8 of section 15-20.4-03, sections 15-20.4-03.1 and 15-20.4-04, subsections 1 and 2 of section 15-20.4-05, sections 15-20.4-06, 15-20.4-08, 15-20.4-09, and 15-20.4-13, and subsection 1 of section 15-20.4-14, of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority of the state board for career and technical education to provide authorizations to operate private postsecondary career schools offering instruction at the level of no higher than the associate of applied science level; to provide for application; to repeal sections 15-20.4-15, 15-20.4-16, 15-20.4-17, and 15-20.4-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to false academic degrees and accreditation mills; and to provide a penalty.
Title
False academic degrees and accreditation mills; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 34 | |
2011-03-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 | |
2011-02-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |