ND HB1127 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 24-05-04, section 24-08-01, and subsection 2 of section 24-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county highways and bridges; and to repeal section 24-08-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cost limitations for a county bridge.
Title
Cost limitations for a county bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Eric Murphy [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Rep. Greg Stemen [R] | Sen. Jonathan Sickler [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 0 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |