ND HB1125 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 4-01-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to control of predatory animals, destructive birds, and injurious field rodents.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 4-01-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to control of predatory animals, destructive birds, and injurious field rodents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 000 | |
2009-04-01 | Concurred | |
2009-03-09 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-20 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1125.html |