ND HB1120 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 50-24.6-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the prior authorization program.
Title
The prior authorization program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2017-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2017-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Anderson J. Lee Clemens |
2017-03-31 | House | Conference committee appointed Seibel Westlind Schneider |
2017-03-31 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 11 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |