ND HB1119 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12-47-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority of the warden of the state penitentiary to make rules.
Title
Authority of the warden of the state penitentiary to make rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |