ND HB1116 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 21-03-07 and sections 57-15-06.6 and 57-47-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds and the authorized uses of the county capital projects levy; to provide an effective date; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
The issuance of general obligation bonds and the authorized uses of the county capital projects levy; to provide an effective date; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor 04/22 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 9 |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 26 |
2021-01-11 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |