ND HB1116 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 26.1-38.1-01, 26.1-38.1-02, 26.1-38.1-03, 26.1-38.1-04, 26.1-38.1-05, 26.1-38.1-06, 26.1-38.1-08, 26.1-38.1-09, 26.1-38.1-10, 26.1-38.1-11, 26.1-38.1-13, 26.1-38.1-14, and 26.1-38.1-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota life and health insurance guaranty association; to repeal section 26.1-38.1-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to application of laws to an insolvent insurer; and to provide for application.
Title
Application of laws to an insolvent insurer; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-01 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-14 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2019-01-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |