ND HB1114 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 30.1-26-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to delegation of the powers of a parent or guardian of a minor or incapacitated person; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Delegation of the powers of a parent or guardian of a minor or incapacitated person; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 45 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:20 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1114.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-8083-01000.pdf |