ND HB1105 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 43-06-15.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disciplinary records of the state board of chiropractic examiners; and to amend and reenact sections 43-06-14.1 and 43-06-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disciplinary records of the state board of chiropractic examiners.
Title
Disciplinary records of the state board of chiropractic examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 89 |
2023-01-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:18 |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |