ND HB1101 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 36-01-08 and 36-01-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee collection for the cost of each brucellosis tag, each identification tag, and each health book the commissioner distributes.
Title
The fee collection for the cost of each brucellosis tag, each identification tag, and each health book the commissioner distributes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:39 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2023-01-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2023-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture |