ND HB1101 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Signed by Governor 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact sections 13-04.1-18, 13-08-16, and 13-11-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the customer information of money brokers, deferred presentment service providers, and debt-settlement providers; to amend and reenact sections 13-04.1-01.1, 13-04.1-02.1, 13-04.1-04, 13-04.1-09, 13-04.1-15, 13-05-04, and 13-05-05.1, subsection
Title
Money brokers, collection agencies, money transmitters, and mortgage loan originators; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor 04/09 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2015-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 7 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 6 2 |
2015-01-19 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-01-16 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1 |
2015-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |