ND HB1101 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 50-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to opioid treatment programs; and to amend and reenact section 50-31-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to opioid treatment programs.
Title
Opioid treatment programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-08 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |