ND HB1097 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 55-08-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state parks gift fund; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
The state parks gift fund; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |