ND HB1092 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 080
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 080
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 14-02.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of disability under the North Dakota Human Rights Act.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 14-02.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of disability under the North Dakota Human Rights Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 080 | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-01-07 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1092.html |