ND HB1087 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 29-32.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to summary disposition; and to amend and reenact section 29-32.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to summary disposition and dismissal.
Title
Summary disposition and dismissal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:31 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-01-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |