ND HB1078 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 25-06-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the facilitation of acquisition of instructional materials in alternate formats to students with print disabilities; to amend and reenact sections 25-06-01 and 25-06-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the facilitation of acquisition of instructional materials in alternate formats to students with print disabilities; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 25-06-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the facilitation of acquisition of instructional materials in alternate formats to students with print disabilities; to amend and reenact sections 25-06-01 and 25-06-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the facilitation of acquisition of instructional materials in alternate formats to students with print disabilities; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-06 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 022 n 002 | |
2009-02-05 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1078.html |