ND HB1077 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 30.1-37 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Electronic Wills Act; and to provide for application.
Title
The Uniform Electronic Wills Act; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |