ND HB1077 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-10-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the state auditor.
Title
The powers and duties of the state auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |