ND HB1077 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 5-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to direct sales by licensed wineries.
Title
Direct sales by licensed wineries.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Eliot Glassheim [D] | Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Philip Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-01-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2013-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |