ND HB1074 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to adopt the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act; and to repeal chapter 15-67 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Management of Institutional Funds Act; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to adopt the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act; and to repeal chapter 15-67 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Management of Institutional Funds Act; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading passed, y 084 n 008 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-20 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans A | |
2009-02-02 | Received from House | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading passed, y 071 n 012 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-28 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 008 n 002 | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 09:20 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1074.html |