ND HB1065 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-16-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the moratorium on the expansion of long-term care bed capacity.
Title
The moratorium on the expansion of long-term care bed capacity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |