ND HB1059 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 27-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disclosure of pending decisions; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Disclosure of pending decisions; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49 |
2023-01-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-06 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 1 |
2023-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |