ND HB1059 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-36-01 and 54-36-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the members and the powers and duties of the Indian affairs commission; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-36-01 and 54-36-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the members and the powers and duties of the Indian affairs commission; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-21 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-17 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 000 | |
2009-04-17 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-17 | Reported back from conf comm, further amends, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Conf comm appointed Andrist J. Lee Anderson | |
2009-04-06 | Conf comm appointed Grande Froseth Wolf | |
2009-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-18 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1059.html |