ND HB1057 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide a statement of legislative intent regarding state employee compensation adjustments.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide a statement of legislative intent regarding state employee compensation adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 66 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 5 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |