ND HB1046 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-39.2-04.9 and 57-40.2-03.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in telecommunications infrastructure development; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in telecommunications infrastructure development; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-01-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |