ND HB1038 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-09-08.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions on an individual's operator's license for nonpayment of child support or failure to obey a subpoena.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-09-08.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to restrictions on an individual's operator's license for nonpayment of child support or failure to obey a subpoena.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-17 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-01-12 | Received from House | |
2009-01-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-01-07 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-07 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1038.html |