ND HB1036 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-04-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the calculation of workforce safety and insurance premiums.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-04-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the calculation of workforce safety and insurance premiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-06 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-14 | Received from House | |
2009-01-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 062 nays 032 | |
2009-01-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 005 | |
2009-01-07 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1036.html |